Senate | 03/29/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 787 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 252 | |
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 252 | |
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |