E
|
05/23/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2881
|
E
|
05/17/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3663
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2038
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3605
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1966
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1966
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1966
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1790
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1049
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2281
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3026
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 836
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 548
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 253
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 253
|
Senate
|
01/20/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|