Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB564 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 564
 (In the Senate - Filed January 20, 2017; February 8, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 5, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 5, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of open meetings requirements to
 certain meetings of a governing body relating to information
 technology security practices.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 551.089, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 551.089.  DELIBERATION REGARDING SECURITY DEVICES OR
 SECURITY AUDITS; CLOSED MEETING [DEPARTMENT OF INFORMATION
 RESOURCES]. This chapter does not require a governmental body [the
 governing board of the Department of Information Resources] to
 conduct an open meeting to deliberate:
 (1)  security assessments or deployments relating to
 information resources technology;
 (2)  network security information as described by
 Section 2059.055(b); or
 (3)  the deployment, or specific occasions for
 implementation, of security personnel, critical infrastructure, or
 security devices.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2059.055(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Network security information is confidential under this
 section if the information is:
 (1)  related to passwords, personal identification
 numbers, access codes, encryption, or other components of the
 security system of a governmental entity [state agency];
 (2)  collected, assembled, or maintained by or for a
 governmental entity to prevent, detect, or investigate criminal
 activity; or
 (3)  related to an assessment, made by or for a
 governmental entity or maintained by a governmental entity, of the
 vulnerability of a network to criminal activity.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *