E
|
06/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4246
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5566
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3362
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3362
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3362
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3358
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2624
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4374
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1602
|
Journal Page: 4373
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4373
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4373
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Pickett
|
Journal Page: 4373
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4373
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1534
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Leach
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4180
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4180
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
Journal Page: 4128
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4120
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1509
|
Journal Page: 4119
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Failed to pass to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4119
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4119
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1110
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 885
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 885
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 885
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 885
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 893
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 850
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Rodrguez
|
Journal Page: 850
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 850
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 850
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 341
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 309
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 293
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 279
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 254
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 254
|
Senate
|
01/20/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|