Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB578 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 23, 2017

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 28, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill May 29, 2017

Conference Committee Report*

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2017
Bill March 22, 2017