E
|
06/01/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5566
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3317
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2963
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1742
|
Journal Page: 4632
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4632
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4632
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4518
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 11
|
Journal Page: 4518
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4518
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4175
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2187
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2187
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1702
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1182
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1182
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1182
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1182
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1182
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1182
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1182
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 893
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 833
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 255
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 255
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|