House | 05/24/2017 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 4783 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 4783 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3746 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3383 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3237 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1903 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1806 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1806 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1806 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1806 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1806 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1805 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1805 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1354 | |
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 256 | |
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 256 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |