Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB599 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Burton S.B. No. 599
 (In the Senate - Filed January 25, 2017; February 8, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the deferral and reduction or waiver of certain
 surcharges assessed under the driver responsibility program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 708, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 708.160 to read as follows:
 Sec. 708.160.  DEFERRAL AND REDUCTION OR WAIVER OF CERTAIN
 SURCHARGES. A court may defer surcharges assessed under this
 chapter against a person who is participating in a drug court
 program under Chapter 123, Government Code, for the underlying
 offense giving rise to the surcharge.  If a person successfully
 completes the drug court program, the court may reduce or waive the
 surcharges assessed against the person.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 surcharge pending on the effective date of this Act, regardless of
 when the surcharge was assessed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *