House | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2073 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1534 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 1338 |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1337 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1337 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1261 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 263 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 263 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |