Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB619 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/26/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R4759 SCL/TJB-D
 By: Estes S.B. No. 619


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to county and municipal cooperation with state and federal
 immigration law enforcement and efforts to enhance international
 border security.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 11, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 364 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 364. STATE AND FEDERAL IMMIGRATION LAW ENFORCEMENT AND
 ENHANCEMENT OF INTERNATIONAL BORDER SECURITY
 Sec. 364.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Immigration detainer request" means a United
 States Department of Homeland Security Form I-247 or a similar or
 successor form that requests a local entity to maintain temporary
 custody of an alien for the federal government.
 (2)  "Immigration laws" means the laws of this state or
 federal law relating to immigrants or immigration, including the
 federal Immigration and Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. Section 1101 et
 seq.).
 Sec. 364.002.  IMMIGRATION AND BORDER SECURITY ORDER OR
 ORDINANCE REQUIRED; COMPTROLLER DATABASE. (a) The commissioners
 court of each county and the governing body of each municipality in
 this state shall:
 (1)  adopt and enforce an order or ordinance, as
 appropriate, that requires the county or municipality to cooperate
 with:
 (A)  state and federal law enforcement in
 enforcing immigration laws; and
 (B)  for counties containing an international
 border and municipalities located wholly or partly in those
 counties, state and federal efforts to enhance international border
 security; and
 (2)  submit a written copy of the order or ordinance to
 the comptroller.
 (b)  The comptroller shall establish and maintain a database
 of counties and municipalities that comply with this section.
 Sec. 364.003.  COMPLAINT; EQUITABLE RELIEF. (a) Any
 person, including the federal government, may file a complaint with
 the attorney general if the person offers evidence to support an
 allegation that a county or municipality has failed to comply with
 Section 364.002.  The person must include with the complaint the
 evidence the person has that supports the complaint.
 (b)  A county or municipality for which the attorney general
 has received a complaint under Subsection (a) shall comply with a
 document request, including a request for supporting documents,
 from the attorney general related to the complaint.
 (c)  If the attorney general determines that a complaint
 filed under Subsection (a) against a county or municipality is
 valid, the attorney general shall, not later than the 10th day after
 the date of the determination, provide written notification to the
 county or municipality that:
 (1)  the complaint has been filed;
 (2)  the attorney general has determined that the
 complaint is valid;
 (3)  the attorney general is authorized to file an
 action to enjoin the violation if the county or municipality does
 not come into compliance with the requirements of Section 364.002
 on or before the 90th day after the date the notification is
 provided; and
 (4)  the authority of the county or municipality to
 impose a sales or use tax will be suspended as provided by Section
 364.004 if the county or municipality is finally determined under
 Subsection (e) to have failed to adopt, submit to the comptroller,
 or enforce an order or ordinance required by Section 364.002.
 (d)  Not later than the 30th day after the day a county or
 municipality receives written notification under Subsection (c),
 the county or municipality shall provide the attorney general with
 a copy of:
 (1)  the county's or municipality's written policies
 related to immigration enforcement actions and international
 border security efforts, if applicable;
 (2)  each immigration detainer request received by the
 county or municipality from the United States Department of
 Homeland Security; and
 (3)  each response sent by the county or municipality
 for a detainer request described by Subdivision (2).
 (e)  If the attorney general determines that a complaint
 filed under Subsection (a) against a county or municipality is
 valid, the attorney general may file a petition for a writ of
 mandamus or apply for other appropriate equitable relief in a
 district court in Travis County or in a county in which the
 principal office of the county or municipality is located to compel
 the county or municipality that fails to comply with Section
 364.002 to comply with that section.  The attorney general may
 recover reasonable expenses incurred in obtaining relief under this
 subsection, including court costs, reasonable attorney's fees,
 investigative costs, witness fees, and deposition costs.
 (f)  An appeal of a suit brought under Subsection (e) is
 governed by the procedures for accelerated appeals in civil cases
 under the Texas Rules of Appellate Procedure. The appellate court
 shall render its final order or judgment with the least possible
 delay.
 Sec. 364.004.  SUSPENSION OF AUTHORITY TO IMPOSE SALES AND
 USE TAXES. (a)  This section applies only to a county or
 municipality that is finally determined in an action filed under
 Section 364.003(e) to have failed to adopt, submit to the
 comptroller, or enforce an order or ordinance required by Section
 364.002.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the
 authority of a county or municipality to which this section applies
 to impose a sales or use tax under Chapter 321 or 323, Tax Code, as
 applicable, and any other sales or use tax the county or
 municipality is otherwise authorized to impose is suspended, and
 the tax may not be collected during the period prescribed by
 Subsection (c).
 (c)  A suspension under Subsection (b) of the authority to
 impose a sales or use tax is for a period of one year beginning on
 the first day of the first calendar quarter that begins after the
 30th day after the date a court issues the order or judgment making
 the final determination described by Subsection (a).
 (d)  Notwithstanding a suspension of the authority of a
 county or municipality to impose a sales or use tax under this
 section, the tax continues during the suspension period to be
 considered as being imposed for purposes of determining the
 combined rate of all sales and use taxes imposed by all political
 subdivisions having territory in the county or municipality.
 (e)  The comptroller may adopt rules necessary to implement
 this section, including rules for providing notice of a suspension
 of taxing authority under this section to retailers engaged in
 business in the affected county or municipality.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than October 1, 2017, the
 commissioners court of each county in this state and the governing
 body of each municipality in this state shall adopt an order or
 ordinance described by Section 364.002, Local Government Code, as
 added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2018, the commissioners court
 of each county in this state and the governing body of each
 municipality in this state shall submit to the comptroller of
 public accounts a copy of the order or ordinance adopted under
 Section 364.002, Local Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the comptroller of
 public accounts shall submit a written report to the legislature on
 the counties and municipalities that have failed to adopt an order
 or ordinance under Section 364.002, Local Government Code, as added
 by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 (b)  Section 364.003, Local Government Code, as added by this
 Act, takes effect November 1, 2017.