Senate | 04/25/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 266 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 266 | |
Senate | 01/26/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/26/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |