Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB632 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2017

                    By: Buckingham S.B. No. 632
 (In the Senate - Filed January 26, 2017; February 13, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of certain state procurement advisory and
 approval procedures.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2155.086 and 2155.087, Government Code,
 are repealed.
 SECTION 2.  On the effective date of this Act, the Statewide
 Procurement Advisory Council is abolished.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *