LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB634
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB634
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB634
Compare Versions
SB634 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB634 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB634 Enrolled May 29, 2017
SB634 Comm Sub May 16, 2017
SB634 Engrossed April 3, 2017
SB634 Comm Sub March 23, 2017
SB634 Introduced January 27, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB634 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB634 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB634 Enrolled May 29, 2017
SB634 Comm Sub May 16, 2017
SB634 Engrossed April 3, 2017
SB634 Comm Sub March 23, 2017
SB634 Introduced January 27, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare