House | 05/20/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4004 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3024 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1718 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1718 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1718 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1718 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1718 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1718 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1718 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffines | Journal Page: 1718 |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1717 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1717 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1570 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1285 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 266 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 266 | |
Senate | 01/27/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/27/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |