House
|
05/20/2017
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3149
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3149
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1660
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1660
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1660
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1660
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1660
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1660
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1660
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffines
|
Journal Page: 1660
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1321
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 266
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 266
|
Senate
|
01/27/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|