Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB640 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 640
2- (In the Senate - Filed January 27, 2017; February 13, 2017,
3- read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
4- April 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
5- Nays 2; April 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+By: Taylor of Collin, et al. S.B. No. 640
72
83
94 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
105 AN ACT
116 relating to equal opportunity for access by home-schooled students
127 to University Interscholastic League sponsored activities;
138 authorizing a fee.
149 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1510 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
1611 amended by adding Section 33.0832 to read as follows:
1712 Sec. 33.0832. EQUAL OPPORTUNITY FOR HOME-SCHOOLED STUDENTS
1813 TO PARTICIPATE IN UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE ACTIVITIES.
1914 (a) In this section, "home-schooled student" has the meaning
2015 assigned by Section 29.916.
2116 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (g), a public school
2217 that participates in an activity sponsored by the University
2318 Interscholastic League shall provide a home-schooled student, who
2419 otherwise meets league eligibility standards to represent that
2520 school in a league activity, with the opportunity to participate in
2621 the activity on behalf of the school in the same manner that the
2722 school provides the opportunity to participate to students enrolled
2823 in the school.
2924 (c) A home-schooled student who seeks to participate or who
3025 participates in a league activity on behalf of a school is subject
3126 to the following relevant policies that apply to students enrolled
3227 in the school: policies regarding registration, age eligibility,
3328 fees, insurance, transportation, physical condition,
3429 qualifications, responsibilities, event schedules, standards of
3530 behavior, and performance.
3631 (d) The parent or person standing in parental relation to a
3732 home-schooled student is responsible for oversight of academic
3833 standards relating to the student's participation in a league
3934 activity. As a condition of eligibility to participate in a league
4035 activity during the first six weeks of a school year, a
4136 home-schooled student must demonstrate grade-level academic
4237 proficiency on any nationally recognized, norm-referenced
4338 assessment instrument, such as the Iowa Test of Basic Skills,
4439 Stanford Achievement Test, California Achievement Test, or
4540 Comprehensive Test of Basic Skills. A home-schooled student
4641 demonstrates the required academic proficiency by achieving a
4742 composite, core, or survey score that is within the average or
4843 higher than average range of scores, as established by the
4944 applicable testing service. For purposes of this subsection, a
5045 school district shall accept assessment results administered or
5146 reported by a third party.
5247 (e) A home-schooled student's demonstration of academic
5348 proficiency under Subsection (d) is sufficient for purposes of that
5449 subsection for the school year in which the student achieves the
5550 required score and the subsequent school year.
5651 (f) After the first six weeks of a school year, the parent or
5752 person standing in parental relation to a home-schooled student
5853 participating in a league activity on behalf of a public school must
5954 periodically, in accordance with the school's grading calendar,
6055 provide written verification to the school indicating that the
6156 student is receiving a passing grade in each course or subject being
6257 taught.
6358 (g) A home-schooled student is not authorized by this
6459 section to participate in a league activity during the remainder of
6560 any school year during which the student was previously enrolled in
6661 a public school.
6762 (h) The University Interscholastic League may not prohibit
6863 a home-schooled student from participating in league activities in
6964 the manner authorized by this section.
7065 (i) With respect to a home-schooled student's education
7166 program, nothing in this section shall be construed to permit an
7267 agency of this state, a public school district, or any other
7368 governmental body to exercise control, regulatory authority, or
7469 supervision over a home-schooled student or a parent or person
7570 standing in parental relation to a home-schooled student beyond the
7671 control, regulatory authority, or supervision required to
7772 participate in a league activity.
7873 (j) Subject only to eligibility requirements under this
7974 section, for a home-schooled student to participate in a league
8075 activity:
8176 (1) the curriculum or assessment requirements,
8277 performance standards, practices, or creed of the education program
8378 provided to a home-schooled student may not be required to be
8479 changed in order for the home-schooled student to participate in a
8580 league activity; and
8681 (2) for a home-schooled student participating in an
8782 education program on January 1, 2017, the education program
8883 provided to that student may not be required to comply with any
8984 state law or agency rule relating to that education program unless
9085 the law or rule was in effect on January 1, 2017.
9186 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
9287 school year.
9388 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
9489 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
9590 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
9691 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
9792 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
98- * * * * *