Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB654 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2017

                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 654
 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2017; February 14, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 May 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 2; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the participation of an advanced practice registered
 nurse as a primary care or network provider for certain
 governmental and other health benefit plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 533.005, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  For purposes of Subsection (a)(13), an advanced
 practice registered nurse may be included as a primary care
 provider in a managed care organization's provider network
 regardless of whether the physician supervising the advanced
 practice registered nurse is in the provider network. This
 subsection may not be construed as authorizing a managed care
 organization to supervise or control the practice of medicine as
 prohibited by Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 62.1551, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 62.1551.  INCLUSION OF CERTAIN HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS IN
 PROVIDER NETWORKS. (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, including
 Sections 843.312 and 1301.052, Insurance Code, the executive
 commissioner shall adopt rules to require a managed care
 organization or other entity to ensure that advanced practice
 registered nurses and physician assistants are available as primary
 care providers in the organization's or entity's provider network.
 The rules must require advanced practice registered nurses and
 physician assistants to be treated in the same manner as primary
 care physicians with regard to:
 (1)  selection and assignment as primary care
 providers;
 (2)  inclusion as primary care providers in the
 provider network; and
 (3)  inclusion as primary care providers in any
 provider network directory maintained by the organization or
 entity.
 (b)  For purposes of Subsection (a), an advanced practice
 registered nurse may be included as a primary care provider in a
 managed care organization's or entity's provider network regardless
 of whether the physician supervising the advanced practice
 registered nurse is in the provider network.
 (c)  This section may not be construed as authorizing a
 managed care organization or other entity to supervise or control
 the practice of medicine as prohibited by Subtitle B, Title 3,
 Occupations Code.
 SECTION 3.  Section 32.024(gg), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (gg)  Notwithstanding any other law, including Sections
 843.312 and 1301.052, Insurance Code, the commission shall ensure
 that advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants
 may be selected by and assigned to recipients of medical assistance
 as the primary care providers of those recipients regardless of
 whether the physician supervising the advanced practice registered
 nurse is included in any directory of providers of medical
 assistance maintained by the commission. This subsection may not
 be construed as authorizing the commission to supervise or control
 the practice of medicine as prohibited by Subtitle B, Title 3,
 Occupations Code.  The commission must require that advanced
 practice registered nurses and physician assistants be treated in
 the same manner as primary care physicians with regard to:
 (1)  selection and assignment as primary care
 providers; and
 (2)  inclusion as primary care providers in any
 directory of providers of medical assistance maintained by the
 commission.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter I, Chapter 843, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 843.3125 to read as follows:
 Sec. 843.3125.  CONTRACTS WITH ADVANCED PRACTICE REGISTERED
 NURSES. (a)  A health maintenance organization may contract
 directly with an advanced practice registered nurse to provide
 health care services on behalf of the health maintenance
 organization regardless of whether the physician supervising the
 advanced practice registered nurse provides health care services
 for the health maintenance organization.
 (b)  This section may not be construed as authorizing a
 health maintenance organization to supervise or control the
 practice of medicine as prohibited by Subtitle B, Title 3,
 Occupations Code.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter B, Chapter 1301, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1301.0525 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1301.0525.  DESIGNATION OF ADVANCED PRACTICE
 REGISTERED NURSES AS PREFERRED PROVIDERS. (a)  An insurer offering
 a preferred provider benefit plan may designate an advanced
 practice registered nurse as a preferred provider regardless of
 whether the physician supervising the advanced practice registered
 nurse is a preferred provider.
 (b)  This section may not be construed as authorizing an
 insurer to supervise or control the practice of medicine as
 prohibited by Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code.
 SECTION 6.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *