House | 05/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3572 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1684 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1039 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1039 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1039 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1039 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1039 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA4 Lucio | Journal Page: 1039 |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1039 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1039 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1037 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1037 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1143 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 278 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 278 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |