LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB669
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB669
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB669
Compare Versions
SB669 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB669 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB669 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
SB669 Engrossed April 10, 2017
SB669 Comm Sub March 20, 2017
SB669 Introduced January 30, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB669 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB669 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB669 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
SB669 Engrossed April 10, 2017
SB669 Comm Sub March 20, 2017
SB669 Introduced January 30, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare