Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB671 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 671
 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2017; February 15, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 5, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; April 5, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the public high school graduation credit requirements
 for a language other than English.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.025, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-21) to read as follows:
 (b-21)  In adopting rules under Subsection (b-1), the State
 Board of Education shall adopt criteria to allow a student to comply
 with the curriculum requirement for one credit under Subsection
 (b-1)(5) by successfully completing a dual language immersion
 program under Section 28.0051 at an elementary school.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *