Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB674 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/14/2017

                    By: Schwertner, Hinojosa S.B. No. 674
 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2017; February 15, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 14, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 March 14, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 674 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an expedited licensing process for certain physicians
 specializing in psychiatry; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 155, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 155.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 155.010.  EXPEDITED LICENSING PROCESS FOR PHYSICIANS
 SPECIALIZING IN PSYCHIATRY. (a)  The board by rule shall create an
 expedited licensing process for an applicant who:
 (1)  holds an unrestricted license to practice medicine
 issued by another state;
 (2)  is board certified in psychiatry by the American
 Board of Psychiatry and Neurology or the American Osteopathic Board
 of Neurology and Psychiatry; and
 (3)  is not ineligible under Section 155.003(e).
 (b)  The expedited licensing process must include a
 procedure for the board to screen applications under this subtitle
 to determine whether an applicant would be eligible for the
 expedited licensing process under this section.
 (c)  The requirements for renewal of a registration permit
 for a license holder issued a license under this section may not be
 more stringent than the requirements for a license holder issued a
 license on a non-expedited basis.
 (d)  The board may establish a fee for the expedited process.
 (e)  This section expires January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Medical Board shall create and
 implement the expedited licensing process under Section 155.010,
 Occupations Code, as added by this Act, not later than January 1,
 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *