LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB674
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB674
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB674
Compare Versions
SB674 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB674 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB674 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB674 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
SB674 Engrossed March 20, 2017
SB674 Comm Sub March 14, 2017
SB674 Introduced January 31, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB674 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB674 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB674 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB674 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
SB674 Engrossed March 20, 2017
SB674 Comm Sub March 14, 2017
SB674 Introduced January 31, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare