Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB674 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 674


 AN ACT
 relating to licensing for certain health professions, including an
 expedited process for certain physicians specializing in
 psychiatry; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 155, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 155.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 155.010.  EXPEDITED LICENSING PROCESS FOR PHYSICIANS
 SPECIALIZING IN PSYCHIATRY. (a)  The board by rule shall create an
 expedited licensing process for an applicant who:
 (1)  holds an unrestricted license to practice medicine
 issued by another state;
 (2)  is board certified in psychiatry by the American
 Board of Psychiatry and Neurology or the American Osteopathic Board
 of Neurology and Psychiatry; and
 (3)  is not ineligible under Section 155.003(e).
 (b)  The expedited licensing process must include a
 procedure for the board to screen applications under this subtitle
 to determine whether an applicant would be eligible for the
 expedited licensing process under this section.
 (c)  The requirements for renewal of a registration permit
 for a license holder issued a license under this section may not be
 more stringent than the requirements for a license holder issued a
 license on a non-expedited basis.
 (d)  The board may establish a fee for the expedited process.
 (e)  This section expires January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  Section 155.056, Occupations Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), an [An]
 applicant must pass each part of an examination within three
 attempts.
 (a-1)  The limit on the number of examination attempts under
 Subsection (a) does not apply to the Texas medical jurisprudence
 examination.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 156, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 156.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 156.010.  REFUSAL FOR VIOLATION OF BOARD ORDER. The
 board may refuse to renew a registration permit issued under this
 chapter if the license holder is in violation of a board order.
 SECTION 4.  The heading to Section 205.251, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 205.251.  [ANNUAL] RENEWAL REQUIRED.
 SECTION 5.  Section 205.251(a), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The medical board by rule shall provide for the annual
 or biennial renewal of a license to practice acupuncture.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter F, Chapter 205, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 205.256 to read as follows:
 Sec. 205.256.  REFUSAL FOR VIOLATION OF BOARD ORDER. The
 acupuncture board may refuse to renew a license issued under this
 chapter if the license holder is in violation of an acupuncture
 board order.
 SECTION 7.  Subchapter E, Chapter 206, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 206.215 to read as follows:
 Sec. 206.215.  REFUSAL FOR VIOLATION OF BOARD ORDER. The
 medical board may refuse to renew a license issued under this
 chapter if the license holder is in violation of a medical board
 order.
 SECTION 8.  Subchapter C, Chapter 601, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 601.113 to read as follows:
 Sec. 601.113.  REFUSAL FOR VIOLATION OF BOARD ORDER. The
 advisory board may refuse to renew a certificate issued under this
 chapter if the certificate holder is in violation of an advisory
 board order.
 SECTION 9.  Section 601.155, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 601.155.  STUDENTS. A person is not required to hold a
 certificate issued under this chapter [or to comply with the
 registration requirements adopted under Section 601.252] if the
 person:
 (1)  is a student enrolled in a training program that
 meets the minimum standards adopted under Section 601.201; and
 (2)  is performing a radiologic procedure in an
 academic or clinical setting as part of the training program.
 SECTION 10.  Section 601.156, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 601.156.  PROCEDURE PERFORMED AS PART OF CONTINUING
 EDUCATION PROGRAM. A person is not required to hold a certificate
 issued under this chapter [or to comply with the registration
 requirements adopted under Section 601.252] if the person is:
 (1)  licensed or otherwise registered as a medical
 radiologic technologist by another state, the American Registry of
 Radiologic Technologists, the American Registry of Clinical
 Radiography Technologists, or a professional organization or
 association recognized by the advisory board;
 (2)  enrolled in a continuing education program that
 meets the requirements adopted under Section 601.108; and
 (3)  performing a radiologic procedure as part of the
 continuing education program for not more than 10 days.
 SECTION 11.  Section 601.203(b), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The following conditions are considered to be a hardship
 for the purposes of Subsection (a):
 (1)  that the applicant:
 (A)  reports an inability to attract and retain
 medical radiologic technologists; and
 (B)  is located in a county with a population of
 less than 50,000;
 (2)  that the applicant is located at a great distance
 from a school of medical radiologic technology;
 (3)  that there is a list of qualified persons who have
 applied to a school of medical radiologic technology whose
 admissions are pending because of a lack of faculty or space;
 (4)  that the school of medical radiologic technology
 produces an insufficient number of graduates in medical radiologic
 technology to meet the needs of the applicant; or
 (5)  any other criteria determined by advisory board
 rule.
 SECTION 12.  Sections 601.252(c) and (d), Occupations Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Rules adopted under this section by the State Board of
 Dental Examiners must:
 (1)  require an authorized person who performs
 radiologic procedures under the delegation of a dentist, other than
 a registered nurse, to register with the dental board [agency that
 licenses the practitioner under whom the person performs radiologic
 procedures];
 (2)  establish reasonable and necessary fees to cover
 the administrative costs incurred by the dental board [agency] in
 administering a registration program created under this
 subsection;
 (3)  establish grounds for the suspension, revocation,
 or nonrenewal of a registration issued under this subsection; and
 (4)  establish standards, in addition to those required
 by this chapter, for training and supervising the operators of the
 equipment.
 (d)  In adopting rules under Subsection (c), the State Board
 of Dental Examiners [an agency] may take into account whether the
 radiologic procedure will be performed by a registered nurse.
 SECTION 13.  Subchapter E, Chapter 602, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 602.214 to read as follows:
 Sec. 602.214.  REFUSAL FOR VIOLATION OF BOARD ORDER. The
 medical board may refuse to renew a license issued under this
 chapter if the license holder is in violation of a medical board
 order.
 SECTION 14.  Section 603.252(a), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  An applicant for a perfusionist license must submit an
 [a sworn] application accompanied by the application fee.
 SECTION 15.  Subchapter G, Chapter 603, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 603.306 to read as follows:
 Sec. 603.306.  REFUSAL FOR VIOLATION OF BOARD ORDER. The
 medical board may refuse to renew a license issued under this
 chapter if the license holder is in violation of a medical board
 order.
 SECTION 16.  Subchapter D, Chapter 604, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 604.158 to read as follows:
 Sec. 604.158.  REFUSAL FOR VIOLATION OF BOARD ORDER. The
 advisory board may refuse to renew a certificate or temporary
 permit issued under this chapter if the certificate or permit
 holder is in violation of an advisory board order.
 SECTION 17.  The Texas Medical Board shall create and
 implement the expedited licensing process under Section 155.010,
 Occupations Code, as added by this Act, not later than January 1,
 2018.
 SECTION 18.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 674 passed the Senate on
 March 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 674 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor