Senate | 04/12/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 290 | |
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 290 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |