E
|
05/23/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2881
|
E
|
05/17/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3663
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2038
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3605
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1971
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1971
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1971
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1967
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1102
|
Journal Page: 3133
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3133
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3133
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2987
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2987
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2987
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1464
|
Journal Page: 2987
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 1473
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1473
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1089
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 895
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hancock
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 831
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 548
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 291
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 291
|
Senate
|
01/31/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|