House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3890 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 2294 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2294 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2071 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1534 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1331 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1331 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1331 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1331 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1307 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1307 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1307 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Rodrguez | Journal Page: 1307 |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1307 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1307 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1307 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 292 | |
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 292 | |
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |