Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB692 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 692
 (In the Senate - Filed January 31, 2017; February 15, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 11, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 2;
 April 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 692 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to regulation by certain counties of lots in platted
 subdivisions that have remained undeveloped.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 232.008(h), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (h)  Regardless of the date land is subdivided or a plat is
 filed for a subdivision, the commissioners court may deny a
 cancellation under this section if the commissioners court
 determines the cancellation will prevent the proposed
 interconnection of infrastructure to pending or existing
 development as defined by Section 232.0395 [232.0085].
 SECTION 2.  Section 232.0085, Local Government Code, is
 transferred to Subchapter B, Chapter 232, Local Government Code,
 redesignated as Section 232.0395, Local Government Code, and
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 232.0395  [232.0085].  CANCELLATION OF CERTAIN
 SUBDIVISIONS IF LAND REMAINS UNDEVELOPED. (a)  This section
 applies only to real property located in the unincorporated area
 of[:
 [(1)     outside municipalities and the extraterritorial
 jurisdiction of municipalities, as determined under Chapter 42; and
 [(2)  in] an affected county, as defined by Section
 16.341, Water Code, that:
 (1)  has adopted the model rules developed under
 Section 16.343, Water Code;[,] and
 (2)  is located along an international border.
 (b)  The commissioners court of a county may cancel, after
 notice and a hearing as required by this section, a subdivision for
 which the plat was filed and approved before September 1, 1989, if:
 (1)  the development of or the making of improvements
 in the subdivision was not begun before June 5, 1995 [the effective
 date of this section]; and
 (2)  the commissioners court by resolution has made a
 finding that the land in question is likely to be developed as a
 colonia.
 (c)  The commissioners court must publish notice of a
 proposal to cancel a subdivision under this section and the time and
 place of the required hearing in a newspaper of general circulation
 in the county for at least 21 days immediately before the date a
 cancellation order is adopted under this section. The county tax
 assessor-collector shall, not later than the 14th day before the
 date of the hearing, deposit with the United States Postal Service a
 similar notice addressed to each owner of land in the subdivision,
 as determined by the most recent county tax roll.
 (d)  At the hearing, the commissioners court shall permit any
 interested person to be heard. At the conclusion of the hearing,
 the court shall adopt an order on whether to cancel the subdivision.
 The commissioners court may adopt an order canceling a subdivision
 if the court determines the cancellation is in the best interest of
 the public. The court may not adopt an order canceling a
 subdivision if:
 (1)  the cancellation interferes with the established
 rights of a person who is a nondeveloper owner and owns any part of
 the subdivision, unless the person agrees to the cancellation; or
 (2)  the owner of the entire subdivision is able to show
 that:
 (A)  the owner of the subdivision is able to
 comply with the minimum state standards and model political
 subdivision rules developed under Section 16.343, Water Code,
 including any bonding requirements; or
 (B)  the land was developed or improved within the
 period described by Subsection (b).
 (e)  The commissioners court shall file the cancellation
 order for recording in the deed records of the county. After the
 cancellation order is filed and recorded, the property shall be
 treated as if it had never been subdivided, and the county chief
 appraiser shall assess the property accordingly. Any liens against
 the property shall remain against the property as it was previously
 subdivided.
 (f)  In this section:
 (1)  "Development" means the making, installing, or
 constructing of buildings and improvements.
 (2)  "Improvements" means water supply, treatment, and
 distribution facilities; wastewater collection and treatment
 facilities; and other utility facilities. The term does not
 include roadway facilities.
 (3)  "Nondeveloper owner" means a person who:
 (A)  owns one or more lots in a subdivision to be
 occupied as the owner's personal residence; and
 (B)  has not participated and does not participate
 in the marketing, promotion, or offering of lots for sale or lease
 as part of a common promotional plan in the ordinary course of
 business.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 232, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 232.045 to read as follows:
 Sec. 232.045.  APPLICABILITY OF INFRASTRUCTURE REQUIREMENTS
 TO LOTS UNDEVELOPED FOR 25 YEARS OR MORE. (a)  This section applies
 only to a county with a population of more than 800,000 that is
 adjacent to an international border.
 (b)  A commissioners court by order may implement a process:
 (1)  applicable to a subdivision in which 50 percent or
 more of the lots are undeveloped or unoccupied on or after the 25th
 anniversary of the date the plat for the subdivision was recorded
 with the county; and
 (2)  through which the county, to the extent
 practicable, may apply to the subdivision more current street,
 road, drainage, and other infrastructure requirements.
 (c)  A regulation or standard adopted by a county under this
 section must be no less stringent than the minimum standards and
 other requirements under the model rules for safe and sanitary
 water supply and sewer services adopted under Section 16.343, Water
 Code, and any other minimum public safety standards that would
 otherwise be applicable to the subdivision.
 (d)  A regulation or standard adopted by a county under this
 section applies only to a lot that is owned by an individual, firm,
 corporation, or other legal entity that directly or indirectly
 offers lots for sale or lease as part of a common promotional plan
 in the ordinary course of business, and each regulation or standard
 must expressly state that limitation. For the purposes of this
 subsection, "common promotional plan" means a plan or scheme of
 operation undertaken by a person or a group acting in concert,
 either personally or through an agent, to offer for sale or lease
 more than two lots when the land is:
 (1)  contiguous or part of the same area of land; or
 (2)  known, designated, or advertised as a common unit
 or by a common name.
 SECTION 4.  A county may not apply an order adopted under
 Section 232.045, Local Government Code, as added by this Act, to a
 subdivision that is the subject of a judicial proceeding pending on
 September 1, 2017, to determine whether the subdivision is subject
 to a valid and existing subdivision plat.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2018.
 * * * * *