E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
E
|
05/22/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4358
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2140
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1362
|
Journal Page: 3792
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3792
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3792
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3724
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1344
|
Journal Page: 3723
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3723
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
3-Cain
|
Journal Page: 3722
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-E. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1146
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 292
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 292
|
Senate
|
01/31/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|