By: Perry S.B. No. 696 (In the Senate - Filed January 31, 2017; February 15, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; April 27, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 27, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 696 By: Perry A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a requirement that the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality obtain or develop updated water availability models for certain river basins. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 16.012, Water Code, is amended by adding Subsection (h-1) to read as follows: (h-1) Not later than December 1, 2020, the commission shall obtain or develop updated water availability models for the Brazos, Guadalupe, San Antonio, Sulphur, and Rio Grande River basins. The commission may collect data from all jurisdictions that allocate the waters of the rivers, including jurisdictions outside this state. This subsection expires September 1, 2021. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect only if a specific appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *