House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1684 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1019 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1019 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1019 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1019 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1019 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1019 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1019 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Buckingham | Journal Page: 1019 |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1018 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1018 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1143 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 956 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 292 | |
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 292 | |
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |