E
|
05/26/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
E
|
05/16/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3603
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3491
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1943
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1943
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1943
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1932
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1773
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1103
|
Journal Page: 3134
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3134
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3133
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2993
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
6-Rinaldi
|
Journal Page: 2993
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
7-VanDeaver
|
Journal Page: 2993
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
6-Rinaldi
|
Journal Page: 2991
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Amended
|
5-K. King
|
Journal Page: 2991
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Martinez
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3769
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Referred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 775
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 775
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 612
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 456
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 456
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 456
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 455
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 455
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 455
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 455
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA6 Taylor of Collin
|
Journal Page: 453
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 452
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 450
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 450
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 443
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 443
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day
|
|
Journal Page: 443
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 464
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 417
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 362
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 293
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 278
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 268
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 257
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 235
|
Senate
|
02/01/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 174
|
Senate
|
01/30/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 138
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 91
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 91
|
Senate
|
01/18/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 42
|
Senate
|
01/17/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 38
|
Senate
|
11/18/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/18/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|