E | 05/18/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/18/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2113 | |
E | 05/08/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1732 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3022 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1722 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1732 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1676 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2518 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#735 | Journal Page: 2518 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2518 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2518 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2466 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2466 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1118 | Journal Page: 2466 |
House | 05/01/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 877 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 877 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 877 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 877 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 877 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 877 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 877 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 304 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 304 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |