E | 05/22/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/22/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2574 | |
E | 05/11/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1904 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3385 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1876 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1904 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1774 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3127 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1094 | Journal Page: 3126 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3126 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3126 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2921 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2921 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2021 | Journal Page: 2921 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2885 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 1573 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1573 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1087 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 574 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 528 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 304 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 304 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 280 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |