Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB717 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2017

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2017
Bill March 20, 2017