S.B. No. 719 AN ACT relating to requiring the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board to collect, study, and report certain data regarding workforce education programs. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 61.0664, Education Code, is amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (f), (g), (h), and (i) to read as follows: (a) The board shall collect and maintain data relating to: (1) undergraduate and graduate level participation of persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities at institutions of higher education, including data regarding applications for admission, admissions, retention, graduation, and professional licensing; and (2) participation of persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities enrolled in a workforce education program, including a workforce continuing education program, that is eligible for state-appropriated formula funding, including data regarding retention, graduation, and professional licensing. (f) The board, in consultation with public junior college districts, shall identify five junior college districts representative of each of the public junior college district peer groups as identified by the board, with two selected from the peer groups of the largest junior college district, and the geographic diversity of this state for the purpose of implementing a pilot program to develop and recommend minimum reporting language for financial and instructional cost information, including information relating to instruction of persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities. In consultation with the Legislative Budget Board, the junior college districts participating in the program shall study best practices for the reporting of revenue and costs allocated across the districts and the practicability of disaggregating financial and instructional cost information by instructional site within a junior college district. Participants in the study shall consider the following data: (1) the number of contact hours, including those generated from distance learning; (2) student attainment of completion milestones as measured by a performance funding formula established by the coordinating board under Section 51.3062(m); (3) the total amount of state appropriations, tax revenue, in-district and out-of-district tuition and fee revenue, or any other revenue received by the junior college districts and the rates or methods by which those revenues are collected; (4) the amount of money expended by the junior college districts for programs related to the participation, retention, and graduation of persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities; (5) a statement of the total amount of money expended by the junior college districts; (6) the number of full-time and adjunct faculty; and (7) any other relevant data or reporting methodologies. (g) Not later than June 1, 2018, the board and the participating junior college districts shall report to the Legislative Budget Board the findings from the study under Subsection (f), including best practices in reporting, methodologies in reporting, and a template for reporting. Each participating junior college district shall report to the board the district's financial and instructional costs using the reporting template not later than: (1) September 1, 2019, for the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2019; and (2) September 1, 2020, for the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2020. (h) To the extent of any conflict, Subsections (f) and (g) prevail over any rider regarding a reporting requirement following the appropriations to Public Community/Junior Colleges in Senate Bill No. 1, Acts of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017 (the General Appropriations Act). (i) This subsection and Subsections (f), (g), and (h) expire December 31, 2020. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 719 passed the Senate on April 3, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 719 passed the House, with amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 8, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor