LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB719
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB719
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB719
Compare Versions
SB719 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB719 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB719 Enrolled May 27, 2017
SB719 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
SB719 Engrossed April 3, 2017
SB719 Comm Sub March 8, 2017
SB719 Introduced February 2, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB719 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB719 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB719 Enrolled May 27, 2017
SB719 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
SB719 Engrossed April 3, 2017
SB719 Comm Sub March 8, 2017
SB719 Introduced February 2, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare