E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2248
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1358
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Amended
|
1-S. Davis
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3155
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 776
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 631
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 558
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 558
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 558
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 558
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 558
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 528
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 305
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 305
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 280
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 269
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|