House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 688 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 688 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 688 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 688 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 688 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 688 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 688 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 306 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 306 | |
Senate | 02/03/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/03/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |