Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB736 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 736


 AN ACT
 relating to a report on the sale of retail electric power by the
 General Land Office.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  The General Land Office shall collect
 information on the sale of electric power by the General Land
 Office.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2018, the General Land
 Office shall provide to the legislature a report on the information
 collected under Subsection (a).  The report must include the
 following information for each year:
 (1)  number of participants;
 (2)  aggregate rates;
 (3)  general contract terms; and
 (4)  the extent of any fiscal impact on state resources
 of administering the program.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 736 passed the Senate on
 April 12, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 24, Nays 7; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 5.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 736 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor