8 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 5 | | relating to a report on the sale of retail electric power by the |
---|
10 | 6 | | General Land Office. |
---|
11 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 8 | | SECTION 1. (a) The General Land Office shall collect |
---|
13 | 9 | | information on the sale of electric power by the General Land |
---|
14 | 10 | | Office. |
---|
15 | 11 | | (b) Not later than September 1, 2018, the General Land |
---|
16 | 12 | | Office shall provide to the legislature a report on the information |
---|
17 | 13 | | collected under Subsection (a). The report must include the |
---|
18 | 14 | | following information for each year: |
---|
19 | 15 | | (1) number of participants; |
---|
20 | 16 | | (2) aggregate rates; |
---|
21 | 17 | | (3) general contract terms; and |
---|
22 | 18 | | (4) the extent of any fiscal impact on state resources |
---|
23 | 19 | | of administering the program. |
---|
24 | 20 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
| 21 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 22 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 23 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 736 passed the Senate on |
---|
| 24 | + | April 12, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 24, Nays 7; and that |
---|
| 25 | + | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the |
---|
| 26 | + | following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 5. |
---|
| 27 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 28 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 29 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 736 passed the House, with |
---|
| 30 | + | amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 146, |
---|
| 31 | + | Nays 0, two present not voting. |
---|
| 32 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 33 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 34 | + | Approved: |
---|
| 35 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 36 | + | Date |
---|
| 37 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 38 | + | Governor |
---|