House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2299 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 1573 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1573 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1422 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 933 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 904 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 904 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 904 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 904 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 904 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 904 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 904 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Huffines | Journal Page: 903 |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 903 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 903 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 306 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 306 | |
Senate | 02/03/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/03/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |