By: Campbell S.B. No. 751 (In the Senate - Filed February 6, 2017; February 22, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs & Border Security; March 13, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 13, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 751 By: Campbell A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the confidentiality of certain information of and the abolishment date of the military base realignment and closure task force. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 436.105, Government Code, is amended by adding Subsection (c-1) and amending Subsection (d) to read as follows: (c-1) Any information written, produced, collected, assembled, or maintained by or for the task force is confidential and exempt from disclosure under Chapter 552 only during the task force's existence. (d) The task force is abolished and this section expires September 1, 2021 [2019]. SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 436, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 436.1051 to read as follows: Sec. 436.1051. MILITARY BASE REALIGNMENT AND CLOSURE TASK FORCE; PRESERVATION OF INFORMATION. (a) On the abolishment of the military base realignment and closure task force, the task force shall transfer all information written, produced, collected, assembled, or maintained by or for the task force to the commission and the commission shall maintain the information. (b) Any information transferred to the commission under Subsection (a) is public information subject to disclosure under Chapter 552. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *