Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB751 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/25/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 751


 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of certain information of and the
 abolishment date of the military base realignment and closure task
 force.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 436.105, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-1) and amending Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (c-1)  Any information written, produced, collected,
 assembled, or maintained by or for the task force is confidential
 and exempt from disclosure under Chapter 552 only during the task
 force's existence.
 (d)  The task force is abolished and this section expires
 September 1, 2021 [2019].
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 436, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 436.1051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 436.1051.  MILITARY BASE REALIGNMENT AND CLOSURE TASK
 FORCE; PRESERVATION OF INFORMATION. (a)  On the abolishment of the
 military base realignment and closure task force, the task force
 shall transfer all information written, produced, collected,
 assembled, or maintained by or for the task force to the commission
 and the commission shall maintain the information.
 (b)  Any information transferred to the commission under
 Subsection (a) is public information subject to disclosure under
 Chapter 552.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 751 passed the Senate on
 April 3, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 751 passed the House on
 May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor