E | 05/27/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/27/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4076 | |
E | 05/19/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2226 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3885 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2119 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2226 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2077 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3616 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Record vote | RV#1295 | Journal Page: 3616 |
House | 05/17/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3616 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3616 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3515 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3515 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2885 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 2124 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2124 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1175 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 959 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 320 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 320 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |