E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6036
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 4146
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4146
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4146
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5824
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5823
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3925
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5593
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5593
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3572
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3147
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4780
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1806
|
Journal Page: 4779
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4779
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Laubenberg
|
Journal Page: 4779
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4778
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 5, Section 58
|
Journal Page: 4778
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4605
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Laubenberg, Moody, and Phelan
|
Journal Page: 4603
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4603
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4430
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4428
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1647
|
Journal Page: 4428
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4428
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
3-Lucio
|
Journal Page: 4427
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 11, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 4425
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Tinderholt
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Uresti
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4326
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1595
|
Journal Page: 4325
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/23/17 6:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4325
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4325
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4248
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3491
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hughes
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1565
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1565
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1565
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1565
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Menndez
|
Journal Page: 1565
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1565
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1321
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 321
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 321
|
Senate
|
02/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|