E | 05/19/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/19/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2226 | |
E | 05/10/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3152 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1726 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Record vote | RV#1021 | Journal Page: 2916 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2916 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2916 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2850 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2850 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1766 | Journal Page: 2850 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3025 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 545 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 528 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 96 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 96 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |