House | 05/20/2017 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 04/03/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1067 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 322 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 322 | |
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |