Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2253
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4036
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1487
|
Journal Page: 4036
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4036
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4036
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3974
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Price
|
Journal Page: 3973
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3973
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3746
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 895
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 836
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 836
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 836
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 836
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 836
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 836
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 836
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 576
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 97
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 97
|
Senate
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|