6 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 5 | | relating to a study and report regarding best practices in the |
---|
8 | 6 | | transfer of course credit between public institutions of higher |
---|
9 | 7 | | education. |
---|
10 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is |
---|
12 | 10 | | amended by adding Section 61.0667 to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 11 | | Sec. 61.0667. STUDY ON BEST PRACTICES IN CREDIT TRANSFER. |
---|
14 | 12 | | (a) The board shall conduct a study to identify best practices in |
---|
15 | 13 | | ensuring that courses transferred to an institution of higher |
---|
16 | 14 | | education for course credit, including courses offered for dual |
---|
17 | 15 | | credit, apply toward a degree program at the institution. |
---|
18 | 16 | | (b) The study must: |
---|
19 | 17 | | (1) evaluate existing articulation agreements that |
---|
20 | 18 | | govern the transfer of course credit between institutions of higher |
---|
21 | 19 | | education; and |
---|
22 | 20 | | (2) identify those institutions of higher education |
---|
23 | 21 | | that are implementing the best practices identified under |
---|
24 | 22 | | Subsection (a). |
---|
25 | 23 | | (c) On request, an institution of higher education shall |
---|
26 | 24 | | provide information to the board as necessary for the board to |
---|
27 | 25 | | perform its duties under this section. |
---|
28 | 26 | | (d) Not later than November 1, 2018, the board shall submit |
---|
29 | 27 | | to the legislature the results of its study under this section and |
---|
30 | 28 | | recommendations for legislative or other action. |
---|
31 | 29 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2019. |
---|
32 | 30 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
33 | 31 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
34 | 32 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
35 | 33 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
36 | 34 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
| 35 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 36 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 37 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 802 passed the Senate on |
---|
| 38 | + | March 22, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 0. |
---|
| 39 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 40 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 41 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 802 passed the House on |
---|
| 42 | + | May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, one |
---|
| 43 | + | present not voting. |
---|
| 44 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 45 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 46 | + | Approved: |
---|
| 47 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 48 | + | Date |
---|
| 49 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 50 | + | Governor |
---|