LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB81
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB81
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB81
Compare Versions
SB81 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB81 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB81 Enrolled May 25, 2017
SB81 Comm Sub May 15, 2017
SB81 Engrossed April 19, 2017
SB81 Comm Sub April 10, 2017
SB81 Introduced November 14, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB81 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB81 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB81 Enrolled May 25, 2017
SB81 Comm Sub May 15, 2017
SB81 Engrossed April 19, 2017
SB81 Comm Sub April 10, 2017
SB81 Introduced November 14, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare